Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.1119   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
  2. S.Amdt.1079   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To modify a provision relating to funding of local and regional food aid procurement projects.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] (Submitted 05/22/2013) (Proposed 06/03/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
    Latest Action: 06/03/13 Amendment SA 1079 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  3. S.Amdt.1061   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  4. S.Amdt.999   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  5. S.Amdt.939   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 05/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  6. S.Amdt.925   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To reform the Federal sugar program, and for other purposes.
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 05/20/2013) (Proposed 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 18
    Latest Action: 05/22/13 Amendment SA 925 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 134.