Limit your search

1-12 of 12
  1. S.Amdt.1167   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.1151   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
    Cosponsors: 9
  3. S.Amdt.1141   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.1109   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] (Submitted 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  5. S.Amdt.1106   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  6. S.Amdt.1100   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 12
  7. S.Amdt.1082   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] (Submitted 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
  8. S.Amdt.1077   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] (Submitted 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
  9. S.Amdt.1039   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  10. S.Amdt.1015   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  11. S.Amdt.1011   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  12. S.Amdt.956   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 15