Limit your search

1-17 of 17
  1. S.Amdt.1156   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/04/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.1152   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.1141   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.1123   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.1061   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  6. S.Amdt.1010   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.1009   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.1008   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.1007   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  10. S.Amdt.1006   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.1005   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  12. S.Amdt.1004   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  13. S.Amdt.1003   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  14. S.Amdt.1002   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  15. S.Amdt.1001   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  16. S.Amdt.1000   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  17. S.Amdt.999   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2