Limit your search

1-9 of 9
  1. S.Amdt.1079   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To modify a provision relating to funding of local and regional food aid procurement projects.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] (Submitted 05/22/2013) (Proposed 06/03/2013)
    Latest Action: 06/03/13 Amendment SA 1079 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  2. S.Amdt.1056   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To end food stamp eligibility for convicted violent rapists, pedophiles, and murderers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] (Submitted 05/21/2013) (Proposed 05/22/2013)
    Latest Action: 05/22/13 Amendment SA 1056 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  3. S.Amdt.1031   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To authorize the use of the insurance fund to reduce fraud and maintain program integrity in the crop insurance program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 05/21/2013) (Proposed 05/23/2013)
    Latest Action: 05/23/13 Amendment SA 1031 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 0. Record Vote Number: 138.
  4. S.Amdt.998   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To establish a pilot program for gigabit Internet projects in rural areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 05/21/2013) (Proposed 05/21/2013)
    Latest Action: 06/10/13 Amendment SA 998 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 38. Record Vote Number: 144.
  5. S.Amdt.992   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To provide access to grocery delivery for homebound seniors and individuals with disabilities eligible for supplemental nutrition assistance benefits.
    Sponsor: Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] (Submitted 05/21/2013) (Proposed 05/22/2013)
    Latest Action: 05/22/13 Amendment SA 992 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  6. S.Amdt.987   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To require the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation to carry out research and development regarding a crop insurance program for alfalfa.
    Sponsor: Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] (Submitted 05/21/2013) (Proposed 06/03/2013)
    Latest Action: 06/03/13 Amendment SA 987 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 18. Record Vote Number: 140.
  7. S.Amdt.953   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To limit the amount of premium subsidy provided by the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation on behalf of any person or legal entity with an average adjusted gross income in excess of $750,000, with a delayed application of the limitation until completion of a study on the effects of the limitation.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 05/20/2013) (Proposed 05/23/2013)
    Latest Action: 05/23/13 Amendment SA 953 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 33. Record Vote Number: 139.
  8. S.Amdt.945   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To clarify eligibility criteria for agricultural irrigation assistance.
    Sponsor: Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] (Submitted 05/20/2013) (Proposed 05/21/2013)
    Latest Action: 05/21/13 Amendment SA 945 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (text as modified: CR S3637)
  9. S.Amdt.919   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To allow Indian tribes to participate in certain soil and water conservation programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] (Submitted 05/20/2013) (Proposed 05/20/2013)
    Latest Action: 05/21/13 Amendment SA 919 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 87 - 8. Record Vote Number: 129.