Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/15/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/15/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/15/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/15/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/15/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/23/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 12/10/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/17/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/05/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/27/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/04/2014