Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/15/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/15/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/15/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/16/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/20/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/20/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/21/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 05/22/2013