Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/15/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/20/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/20/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/23/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/03/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/10/2013