Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 05/16/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/20/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/20/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/31/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 02/24/2014