Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/04/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 06/04/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/04/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/04/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/10/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/10/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/10/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/17/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/17/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/27/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/27/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/09/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/17/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/23/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/25/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 08/01/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 11/07/2013