Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/23/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/19/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/06/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 03/27/2014