Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/20/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/21/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 08/01/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/12/2013
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/19/2014