Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/21/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/21/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/21/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/21/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/21/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/21/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/21/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/21/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/21/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/22/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/03/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/03/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/03/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/10/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/17/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/25/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 07/25/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/12/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/11/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/24/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/13/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/17/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/09/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/29/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/31/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew