Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
05/09/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-101.
05/09/2014 Signed by President.
04/30/2014 Presented to President.
04/28/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3203-3205)
04/10/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S2359-2361)
03/27/2014 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-139.
05/21/2013 Introduced in Senate