Refine your search

21 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
05/09/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-101.
05/09/2014 Signed by President.
04/30/2014 Senate Presented to President.
04/28/2014-4:31pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3203-3205)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-4:11pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 994.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-4:11pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3203-3207)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-4:11pm House Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-2:41pm House Held at the desk.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-2:10pm House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/10/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/10/2014 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2359-2361)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/10/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2970 Amendment SA 2970 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/10/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2971 Amendment SA 2971 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/10/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2971 Amendment SA 2971 proposed by Senator Warner for Senator Carper to Amendment SA 2970. (consideration: CR S2359; text: CR S2359)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/10/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2970 Amendment SA 2970 proposed by Senator Warner for Senator Carper. (consideration: CR S2359)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/10/2014 Senate The committee substitute was withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/10/2014 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2359-2362)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/27/2014 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 337.
Type of Action: Calendars
03/27/2014 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-139.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
11/06/2013 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
05/21/2013 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral