Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/21/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/21/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/21/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/22/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/06/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/06/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/10/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/09/2013