There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event to celebrate the birthday of King Kamehameha.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
05/14/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 146).(text: CR H2584)
04/08/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/08/2013Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2474)
03/22/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
05/14/2013-7:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/14/2013-7:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 146). (text: CR H2584)
05/14/2013-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2587-2588)
05/14/2013-5:42pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/14/2013-5:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. Con. Res. 10.
05/14/2013-5:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2584-2586)
05/14/2013-5:30pmHouseMrs. Miller (MI) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
04/09/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
04/09/2013-2:19pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/09/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/08/2013SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/08/2013SenateSenate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2474)
03/22/2013SenateReferred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2339)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 03/22/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration03/22/2013 Referred to
04/08/2013 Discharged from
House Administration04/09/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.10. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/14/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event on June 9, 2013, to celebrate the birthday of King Kamehameha (Hawaii).