Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/16/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/23/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/01/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/27/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/16/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/24/2014