There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for the unveiling of a statue of Frederick Douglass.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2827)
05/16/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3585; text as passed Senate: CR S3584)
05/16/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
05/21/2013-2:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2013-2:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2827)
05/21/2013-2:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. Con. Res. 16.
05/21/2013-2:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2827-2828)
05/21/2013-2:12pmHouseMrs. Miller (MI) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
05/20/2013-5:10pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/20/2013-5:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/20/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2013SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3585; text as passed Senate: CR S3584)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 05/16/2013

Committees (0)

As of 01/26/2020 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.16 - A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for the unveiling of a statue of Frederick Douglass.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.16.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.16. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/21/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event on June 19, 2013, to unveil a statue of Frederick Douglass.