Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (06/27/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, June 27, 2013, through Friday, July 5, 2013, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, July 8, 2013.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, June 28, 2013, through Friday, July 5, 2013, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, July 8, 2013.