Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (08/01/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns: (1) on any day from Thursday, August 1, 2013, through Sunday, August 11, 2013, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, August 12, 2013; and (2) on such date, it stand adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, September 9, 2013.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, August 2, 2013, through Friday, September 6, 2013, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, September 9, 2013.