Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/16/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Wednesday, October 16, 2013, through Friday, October 25, 2013, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, October 28, 2013.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Wednesday, October 16, 2013, through Monday, October 21, 2013, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, October 22, 2013.