Text: S.Con.Res.24 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill

S. CON. RES. 24 Agreed to October 16, 2013


AT THE FIRST SESSION

Begun and held at the City of Washington on Thursday,
the third day of January, two thousand and thirteen

    Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring), That when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Wednesday, October 16, 2013, through Friday, October 25, 2013, on a motion offered pursuant to this concurrent resolution by its Majority Leader or his designee, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, October 28, 2013, or such other time on that day as may be specified by its Majority Leader or his designee in the motion to recess or adjourn, or until the time of any reassembly pursuant to section 2 of this concurrent resolution, whichever occurs first; and that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Wednesday, October 16, 2013, through Monday, October 21, 2013, on a motion offered pursuant to this current resolution by its Majority Leader or his designee, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, October 22, 2013, or until the time of any reassembly pursuant to section 2 of this concurrent resolution, whichever occurs first.

    Sec. 2. The Majority Leader of the Senate and the Speaker of the House, or their respective designees, acting jointly after consultation with the Minority Leader of the Senate and the Minority Leader of the House, shall notify the Members of the Senate and House, respectively, to reassemble at such place and time as they may designate if, in their opinion, the public interest shall warrant it.

    Attest:









    Secretary of the Senate  

    Attest:









    Clerk of the House of Representatives