Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/08/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/16/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/16/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 01/27/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/27/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/28/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/28/2014