Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/22/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, November 21, 2013, through Friday, December 6, 2013, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, December 9, 2013.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, November 21, 2013, through Tuesday, November 26, 2013, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, December 2, 2013.