Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/04/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Friday, January 4, 2013, through Monday, January 21, 2013, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, January 21, 2013.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, January 4, 2013, through Saturday, January 5, 2013, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, January 14, 2013.