Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/26/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Friday, December 20, 2013, through Tuesday, December 31, 2013, it stand adjourned until 11:45 a.m. on Friday, January 3, 2014.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Monday, December 23, 2013, through Tuesday, December 31, 2013, it stand adjourned until 11:00 a.m. on Friday, January 3, 2014.