Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/12/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/12/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/12/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/12/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/12/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/12/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/12/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/12/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/12/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/12/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/12/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/13/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/03/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/07/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/09/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/09/2014