Text: S.Con.Res.44 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill

S. CON. RES. 44 Agreed to September 19, 2014


AT THE SECOND SESSION

Begun and held at the City of Washington on Friday,
the third day of January, two thousand and fourteen

    Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring), That when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, September 18, 2014, through Tuesday, October 14, 2014, on a motion offered pursuant to this concurrent resolution by its Majority Leader or his designee, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Wednesday, October 15, 2014, or such other time on that day as may be specified by its Majority Leader or his designee in the motion to recess or adjourn; and that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on Wednesday, October 15, 2014, it stand adjourned until 12:00 noon on Wednesday, November 12, 2014, or such other time on that day as may be specified by its Majority Leader or his designee, or until the time of any reassembly pursuant to section 2 of this concurrent resolution, whichever occurs first; and that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, September 18, 2014, through Friday, November 7, 2014, on a motion offered pursuant to this concurrent resolution by its Majority Leader or his designee, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday, November 12, 2014, or until the time of any reassembly pursuant to section 3 of this concurrent resolution, whichever occurs first.

    Sec. 2. (a) The Majority Leader of the Senate or his designee, after concurrence with the Minority Leader of the Senate, shall notify the Members of the Senate to reassemble at such place and time as he may designate if, in his opinion, the public interest shall warrant it.

    (b) After reassembling pursuant to subsection (a), when the Senate adjourns on a motion offered pursuant to this subsection by its Majority Leader or his designee, the Senate shall again stand adjourned pursuant to the first section of this concurrent resolution.

    Sec. 3. (a) The Speaker or his designee, after consultation with the Minority Leader of the House, shall notify the Members of the House to reassemble at such place and time as he may designate if, in his opinion, the public interest shall warrant it.

    (b) After reassembling pursuant to subsection (a), when the House adjourns on a motion offered pursuant to this subsection by its Majority Leader or his designee, the House shall again stand adjourned pursuant to the first section of this concurrent resolution.

    Attest:









    Secretary of the Senate  

    Attest:









    Clerk of the House of Representatives  

    Share This