Summary: S.Con.Res.44 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/19/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, September 18, 2014, through Tuesday, October 14, 2014, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Wednesday, October 15, 2014, and that when it recesses or adjourns on Wednesday, October 15, 2014, it stand adjourned until 12:00 noon on Wednesday, November 12, 2014.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, September 18, 2014, through Friday, November 7, 2014, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday, November 12, 2014.