Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/07/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/11/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/19/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/20/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/20/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/22/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/08/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/16/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/18/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/17/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/27/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 03/05/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/05/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/13/2014