Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/18/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/18/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/19/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/19/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/08/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 04/08/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 04/08/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/25/2014