Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/13/2013 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
10/30/2013 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
10/16/2013 To conference: Pursuant to a previous special order, the House insisted on its amendment and requested a conference.
10/16/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
03/23/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 49. Record Vote Number: 92.(text: CR 4/8/13 S2458-2478)
03/15/2013 Committee on the Budget. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Murray under authority of the order of the Senate of 03/14/2013. Without written report.
03/15/2013 Introduced in Senate