Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/11/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/13/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/06/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/06/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/09/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/03/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/13/2014