Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/20/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/04/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/06/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/06/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/10/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/20/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/25/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/25/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/10/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/09/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/30/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 11/13/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/12/2014