Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/17/2013
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 04/02/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/07/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/16/2014