There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to contributions and expenditures intended to affect elections.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2014By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-223. Minority views filed.
07/17/2014Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/18/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (27)

Date All Actions
09/11/2014Cloture on the joint resolution not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 42. Record Vote Number: 261. (consideration: CR S5543-5544; text: CR S5543-5544)
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014Cloture motion on the joint resolution presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S5487; text: CR S5487)
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014S.Amdt.3797 Amendment SA 3797 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3796. (consideration: CR S5487; text: CR S5487) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014S.Amdt.3796 Amendment SA 3796 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3795. (consideration: CR S5487; text: CR S5487) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014S.Amdt.3795 Amendment SA 3795 proposed by Senator Reid. (consideration: CR S5487; text: CR S5487) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014Motion by Senator Reid to recommit to Senate Committee on the Judiciary with instructions to report back forthwith with amendment SA 3795 made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5487)
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014S.Amdt.3794 Amendment SA 3794 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3793. (consideration: CR S5487; text: CR S5487) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014S.Amdt.3793 Amendment SA 3793 proposed by Senator Reid to language proposed to be stricken by the committee-reported substitute. (consideration: CR S5487; text: CR S5487) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014S.Amdt.3792 Amendment SA 3792 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3791. (consideration: CR S5487; text: CR S5487) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014S.Amdt.3791 Amendment SA 3791 proposed by Senator Reid to the committee-reported substitute. (consideration: CR S5487; text: CR S5487) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S5487; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S5487)
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5487)
Action By: Senate
09/10/2014Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5468-5470, S5471-5472, S5472-5474, S5497, S5501-5502)
Action By: Senate
09/09/2014Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5391, S5398-5402, S5407-5409, S5419-5424)
Action By: Senate
09/08/2014Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 79 - 18. Record Vote Number: 259. (consideration: CR S5366)
Action By: Senate
09/08/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5349-5351, S5366-5367)
Action By: Senate
08/01/2014Cloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S5322-5323; text: CR S5322-5323)
Action By: Senate
08/01/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5317-5318, S5322-5323)
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5197)
Action By: Senate
07/30/2014By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-223. Minority views filed.
Action By: Senate
07/23/2014Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held.
07/17/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 471.
Action By: Senate
07/17/2014Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/10/2014Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/18/2014Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights
06/03/2014Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-889.
06/18/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/18/2013
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/19/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/19/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/19/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/20/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/24/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/27/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/17/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/17/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/23/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/09/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 10/08/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/28/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 11/20/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/02/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 04/02/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/02/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/28/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/28/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/29/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/30/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/01/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/06/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/08/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/12/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/20/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/02/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/05/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/07/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/08/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/15/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/30/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/30/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary06/18/2013 Referred to
06/03/2014 Hearings by
07/10/2014 Markup by
07/17/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-223
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights06/18/2014 Markup by
06/18/2014 Reported by
Senate Rules and Administration07/23/2014 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.19. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/17/2014)

Constitutional Amendment - Authorizes Congress and the states to regulate and set reasonable limits on the raising and spending of money by candidates and others to influence elections.

Grants Congress and the states the power to implement and enforce this amendment by appropriate legislation, and to distinguish between natural persons and corporations or other artificial entities created by law, including by prohibiting such entities from spending money to influence elections.

Declares that nothing in this amendment shall be construed to grant Congress or the states the power to abridge the freedom of the press.