Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/18/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/19/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/19/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/19/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/20/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/24/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/27/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/17/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/17/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/23/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/09/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/08/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/28/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 11/20/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/02/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 04/02/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/02/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/28/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/28/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/29/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/30/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/01/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/06/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/08/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/12/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/20/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/02/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/05/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/07/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/08/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/15/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/30/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/30/2014