Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
02/21/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-85.
02/21/2014 Signed by President.
02/14/2014 Presented to President.
02/11/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H1759)
02/11/2014 Committee on House Administration discharged.
01/29/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S607)
01/29/2014 Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S607)
12/11/2013 Introduced in Senate