Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/28/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/28/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 01/29/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/31/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 02/14/2013