Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/21/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/21/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/11/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/13/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/18/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/24/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/25/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/09/2013