Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/04/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/06/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/17/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/19/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/11/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/15/2013