Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/10/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/10/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 06/10/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 06/10/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/13/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/25/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/26/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/15/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/30/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/17/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/07/2013