Text: S.Res.225 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/12/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 225

To express the sense of the Senate that Congress should establish a joint select committee to investigate and report on the attack on the United States diplomatic facility and American personnel in Benghazi, Libya, on September 11, 2012.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
September 12, 2013

Mr. Cruz (for himself, Mr. Vitter, Mr. Blunt, Mr. Toomey, Mr. Paul, Mr. Scott, Mr. Lee, Mr. Inhofe, Ms. Ayotte, Mr. Portman, Mr. Coburn, Mr. Risch, Mr. Johnson of Wisconsin, Mr. Heller, Mr. Isakson, Mr. Crapo, Mr. Roberts, Mr. Burr, Mr. Graham, Mr. Barrasso, Mr. Enzi, Mr. Grassley, and Mr. Cochran) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration


RESOLUTION

To express the sense of the Senate that Congress should establish a joint select committee to investigate and report on the attack on the United States diplomatic facility and American personnel in Benghazi, Libya, on September 11, 2012.

Whereas the September 11, 2012, terrorist attack on the United States diplomatic facility in Benghazi, Libya, resulted in the brutal deaths of four Americans: Ambassador Christopher Stevens, Foreign Service Officer Sean Smith, and former Navy SEALS Glen Doherty and Tyrone Woods;

Whereas the Nation commemorates and mourns the loss of these American heroes;

Whereas Ambassador Christopher Stevens is the first United States ambassador to be murdered since Ambassador Adolph Dubs was kidnapped and killed in Afghanistan in 1979;

Whereas President Barack Obama declared in his first address to the Nation about the attack on September 12, 2012, “make no mistake, we will work with the Libyan government to bring to justice the killers who attacked our people,” yet there has been no action of reprisal and no justice rendered;

Whereas failure to hold accountable the perpetrators of this vicious attack will leave terrorists around the world with the impression that they can kill Americans and escape the consequences—increasing the likelihood of future attacks;

Whereas progress in the investigation into the attacks on the United States diplomatic facility has been disappointing, and no suspects are in United States custody;

Whereas whistleblowers, including former Deputy Chief of Mission Gregory Hicks, have reported unwarranted repercussions and fear of retaliation;

Whereas the Department of State's lack of adequate cooperation has prevented congressional committees from properly investigating and receiving direct testimony on behalf of Benghazi survivors;

Whereas the American people deserve to have a complete account from their government of the events in Benghazi before, during, and after the September 11, 2012, attack because, as Gregory Hicks said, “the American people need to have the story. And Ambassador Chris Stevens, Sean Smith, Ty Woods and Glen Doherty's names are names that should be remembered by every American for the sacrifice that they made.”; and

Whereas the White House declared on September 10, 2013, “We remain committed to bringing the perpetrators of the Benghazi attacks to justice and to ensuring the safety of our brave personnel serving overseas”: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That it is the sense of the Senate that Congress should establish a joint select committee to investigate and report on the attack on the United States diplomatic facility and American personnel in Benghazi, Libya on September 11, 2012.