There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original resolution authorizing the reporting of committee funding resolutions for the period October 1, 2013, through February 28, 2015.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/03/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7170)
09/17/2013Committee on Rules and Administration. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Schumer. Without written report.(text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S6527)
09/17/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
10/03/2013Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7170)
09/17/2013Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 188.
09/17/2013Committee on Rules and Administration. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Schumer. Without written report. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S6527)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration09/17/2013 Reported original measure

No related bill information was received for S.Res.228.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.228. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (10/03/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Provides that by September 20, 2013, each Senate committee shall report one resolution authorizing the committee to make expenditures out of the contingent fund of the Senate to defray its expenses, including the compensation of staff members, for October 1, 2013, through February 28, 2015.

Authorizes the Committee on Rules and Administration to report one authorization resolution containing more than one committee authorization resolution for such period.