Text: S.Res.229 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (09/17/2013)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Res. 229 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]

                                                       Calendar No. 189
113th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. RES. 229

 Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Rules and Administration.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           September 17, 2013

 Mr. Schumer, from the Committee on Rules and Administration, reported 
  the following original resolution; which was placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Rules and Administration.

    Resolved, That, in carrying out its powers, duties, and functions 
under the Standing Rules of the Senate, in accordance with its 
jurisdiction under Rule XXV of such rules, including holding hearings, 
reporting such hearings, and making investigations as authorized by 
paragraphs 1 and 8 of Rule XXVI of the Standing Rules of the Senate, 
the Committee on Rules and Administration is authorized from October 1, 
2013, through September 30, 2014, and October 1, 2014, through February 
28, 2015, in its discretion (1) to make expenditures from the 
contingent fund of the Senate, (2) to employ personnel, and (3) with 
the prior consent of the government department or agency concerned and 
the Committee on Rules and Administration, to use on a reimbursable or 
non-reimbursable basis the services of personnel of any such department 
or agency.
    Sec. 2. (a) The expenses of the committee for the period October 1, 
2013, through September 30, 2014, under this resolution shall not 
exceed $2,334,743, of which amount (1) not to exceed $75,000 may be 
expended for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, 
or organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the 
Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 72a(i))), and (2) not 
to exceed $12,000 may be expended for the training of the professional 
staff of such committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) 
of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 72a(j))).
    (b) For the period October 1, 2014, through February 28, 2015, 
expenses of the committee under this resolution shall not exceed 
$972,810, of which amount (1) not to exceed $31,250 may be expended for 
the procurement of the services of individual consultants, or 
organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the 
Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 72a(i))), and (2) not 
to exceed $5,000 may be expended for the training of the professional 
staff of such committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) 
of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 72a(j))).
    Sec. 3.  The committee shall report its findings, together with 
such recommendations for legislation as it deems advisable, to the 
Senate at the earliest practicable date, but not later than February 
28, 2015.
    Sec. 4.  Expenses of the committee under this resolution shall be 
paid from the contingent fund of the Senate upon vouchers approved by 
the chairman of the committee, except that vouchers shall not be 
required (1) for the disbursement of salaries of employees paid at an 
annual rate, or (2) for the payment of telecommunications provided by 
the Office of the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper, United States 
Senate, or (3) for the payment of stationery supplies purchased through 
the Keeper of the Stationery, United States Senate, or (4) for payments 
to the Postmaster, United States Senate, or (5) for the payment of 
metered charges on copying equipment provided by the Office of the 
Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper, United States Senate, or (6) for the 
payment of Senate Recording and Photographic Services, or (7) for 
payment of franked and mass mail costs by the Sergeant at Arms and 
Doorkeeper, United States Senate.
    Sec. 5.  There are authorized such sums as may be necessary for 
agency contributions related to the compensation of employees of the 
committee from October 1, 2013, through September 30, 2014, and October 
1, 2014, through February 28, 2015, to be paid from the Appropriations 
account for ``Expenses of Inquiries and Investigations''.




                                                       Calendar No. 189

113th CONGRESS

  1st Session

                              S. RES. 229

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION

 Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Rules and Administration.

_______________________________________________________________________

                           September 17, 2013

                         Placed on the calendar