Text: S.Res.246 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (09/19/2013)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Res. 246 Agreed to Senate (ATS)]

113th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. RES. 246

 Recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and 
 culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions 
                    of Latinos to the United States.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           September 19, 2013

   Mr. Menendez (for himself, Mr. Reid, Mr. Cornyn, Mr. Begich, Mr. 
Bennet, Mrs. Boxer, Mr. Coons, Mr. Durbin, Mrs. Feinstein, Mrs. Hagan, 
Mr. Heinrich, Mr. Kaine, Ms. Mikulski, Mr. Nelson, Mr. Reed, Mr. Rubio, 
  Mr. Schumer, Ms. Stabenow, Mr. Udall of Colorado, Mr. Udall of New 
Mexico, Mr. Warner, Mr. Brown, Mr. Merkley, Mr. Heller, Mr. Casey, Ms. 
Warren, Mr. Enzi, Mrs. Murray, and Mr. Cardin) submitted the following 
             resolution; which was considered and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and 
 culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions 
                    of Latinos to the United States.

Whereas from September 15, 2013 through October 15, 2013, the United States 
        celebrates Hispanic Heritage Month;
Whereas the Census Bureau estimates the Hispanic population in the United States 
        at over 53,000,000 people, making Hispanic Americans the largest racial 
        or ethnic minority group in the United States overall and in 21 
        individual States;
Whereas the United States Hispanic population is ranked 2nd worldwide, exceeding 
        the size of every country except Mexico;
Whereas 8 States in the United States had 1,000,000 or more Latino residents in 
        2012, inlcuding Arizona, California, Colorado, Florida, Illinois, New 
        Jersey, New York, and Texas;
Whereas Latinos grew the United States population by 1,100,000 between July 1, 
        2011 and July 1, 2012, accounting for nearly half of all population 
        growth during this period;
Whereas the Hispanic population in the United States is projected to grow to 
        128,800,000 by 2060, at which point the Hispanic population will 
        comprise 31 percent of the total United States population, which is 
        nearly double the 2012 percentage;
Whereas 1 in 4 public school students in the United States is Hispanic, and the 
        total number of school-age Hispanic children in the United States is 
        expected to reach 28,000,000 by 2050;
Whereas 19 percent of all college students between the ages of 18 and 24 years 
        old are Hispanic, making Hispanics the largest racial or ethnic minority 
        group on college campuses in the United States, including both 2-year 
        community colleges and 4-year colleges and universities;
Whereas a record 11,200,000 Latinos voted in the 2012 presidential election, 
        representing a record 8.4 percent of the electorate in the United 
        States;
Whereas the annual purchasing power of Hispanic Americans is an estimated 
        $1,200,000,000,000 and is expected to grow to $1,500,000,000,000 by 
        2015;
Whereas there are approximately 3,000,000 Hispanic-owned firms in the United 
        States, supporting millions of employees nationwide and contributing 
        more than $500,000,000,000 in revenue to the economy of the United 
        States;
Whereas Hispanic-owned businesses represent the fastest-growing segment of small 
        businesses in the United States, with Hispanic entrepreneurs starting 
        businesses at more than double the national rate;
Whereas as of August 2013, nearly 25,000,0000 Hispanic workers represented 16 
        percent of the total civilian labor force in the United States and the 
        share of Latino labor force participation is expected to grow to 18.5 
        percent by 2020;
Whereas Latinos have the highest labor force participation rate of any racial or 
        ethnic group (66.3 percent compared to 63.2 percent overall);
Whereas Hispanic Americans serve in all branches of the Armed Forces and have 
        bravely fought in every war in the history of the United States;
Whereas as of July 31, 2013, 162,717 Hispanic active duty service members served 
        with distinction in the Armed Forces of the United States;
Whereas as of June 30, 2013, a total of 82,343 Hispanics had served in 
        Afghanistan;
Whereas as of September 2013, 668 United States military fatalities in Iraq and 
        Afghanistan have been Hispanic;
Whereas more than 80,000 Hispanics served in the Vietnam War, representing 5.5 
        percent of individuals who made the ultimate sacrifice for the United 
        States in the conflict, even though Hispanics comprised only 4.5 percent 
        of the population of the United States at the time;
Whereas 140,000 Hispanic soldiers served in the Korean War;
Whereas as of September 2013, there are an estimated 1,377,000 Hispanic veterans 
        of the Armed Forces of the United States;
Whereas 44 Hispanic Americans have received the Congressional Medal of Honor, 
        the highest award for valor in action against an enemy force that can be 
        bestowed on an individual serving in the Armed Forces of the United 
        States;
Whereas Hispanic Americans are dedicated public servants, holding posts at the 
        highest levels of government, including 1 seat on the Supreme Court, 3 
        seats in the Senate, 35 seats in the House of Representatives, and 1 
        seat in the Cabinet; and
Whereas Hispanic Americans harbor a deep commitment to family and community, an 
        enduring work ethic, and a perseverance to succeed and contribute to 
        society: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the Senate--
            (1) recognizes the celebration of Hispanic Heritage Month 
        from September 15, 2013 through October 15, 2013;
            (2) esteems the integral role of Latinos and the manifold 
        heritage of Latinos in the economy, culture, and identity of 
        the United States; and
            (3) urges the people of the United States to observe 
        Hispanic Heritage Month with appropriate programs and 
        activities that celebrate the cultural contributions of Latinos 
        to American life.
                                 <all>