Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/25/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/08/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/28/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 10/29/2013