Text: S.Res.254 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (10/29/2013)

1st Session
S. RES. 254

Designating November 2, 2013, as “National Bison Day”.


September 24, 2013

Mr. Enzi (for himself, Mr. Johnson of South Dakota, Ms. Baldwin, Mr. Cochran, Mrs. Gillibrand, Mr. Heinrich, Ms. Heitkamp, Mr. Hoeven, Mr. Johanns, Mr. Lee, Mr. Moran, Mr. Portman, Mr. Schumer, Mr. Tester, Mr. Thune, Mr. Udall of New Mexico, Mr. Whitehouse, Mr. Hatch, Mr. Bennet, Mr. Roberts, Mr. Wicker, Mr. Inhofe, Mr. Cornyn, Mr. Markey, and Mr. Donnelly) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary

October 29, 2013

Committee discharged; considered and agreed to


Designating November 2, 2013, as “National Bison Day”.

    Whereas bison are considered a historical symbol of the United States;

    Whereas bison were integrally linked with the economic and spiritual lives of many Indian tribes through trade and sacred ceremonies;

    Whereas there are more than 60 Indian tribes participating in the Intertribal Buffalo Council;

    Whereas numerous members of Indian tribes are involved in bison restoration on tribal land;

    Whereas members of Indian tribes have a combined herd on more than 1,000,000 acres of tribal land;

    Whereas the Intertribal Buffalo Council is a tribal organization incorporated pursuant to section 17 of the Act of June 18, 1934 (commonly known as “Indian Reorganization Act”) (25 U.S.C. 477);

    Whereas bison can play an important role in improving the types of grasses found in landscapes to the benefit of grasslands;

    Whereas a bison has been depicted on the official seal of the Department of the Interior since 1912;

    Whereas bison hold significant economic value for private producers and rural communities;

    Whereas, as of 2007, the United States had 4,499 bison producers creating jobs and providing a sustainable and healthy meat source contributing to the food security of the United States;

    Whereas a bison is portrayed on 2 State flags;

    Whereas the bison has been adopted by 3 States as the official mammal or animal of those States;

    Whereas the buffalo nickel played an important role in modernizing the currency of the United States;

    Whereas several sports teams have the bison as a mascot, which highlights the iconic significance of bison in the United States;

    Whereas on December 8, 1905, William Hornaday, Theodore Roosevelt, and others formed the American Bison Society in response to the near extinction of bison in the United States;

    Whereas on October 11, 1907, the American Bison Society sent 15 bison to the first big game refuge in the United States, which was known as the “Wichita Reserve Bison Refuge”;

    Whereas in 2005, the American Bison Society was reestablished, bringing together bison ranchers, managers from Indian tribes, Federal and State agencies, conservation organizations, and natural and social scientists from the United States, Canada, and Mexico to create a vision for the North American bison in the 21st century;

    Whereas there are bison herds in National Wildlife Refuges and National Parks;

    Whereas there are bison in State-managed herds across 11 States;

    Whereas there is a growing effort to celebrate and officially recognize the historical, cultural, and economic significance of the North American bison to the heritage of the United States; and

    Whereas members of Indian tribes, bison producers, conservationists, sportsmen, educators, and other public and private partners have participated in the first annual National Bison Day on November 1, 2012, and are committed to continuing this tradition annually on the first Saturday of November: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the Senate—

(1) designates November 2, 2013, the first Saturday of November, as National Bison Day; and

(2) encourages the people of the United States to observe the day with appropriate ceremonies and activities.