Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 02/11/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/14/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/14/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/14/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/14/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/27/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/04/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/04/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/04/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/04/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/05/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/07/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/07/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/08/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/08/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/20/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/07/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/07/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/24/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/29/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/12/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/21/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 11/20/2014