Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/13/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/16/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/17/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/17/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 12/18/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/18/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/19/2013